THE SAILORS' FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assets have been wound up, and are now in the control of the Royal Navy & Royal Marines Charity as from the 10 January 2007.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 December 1970: Standard registration
- 22 September 2009: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 22 September 2009: Funds transferred to 1117794 THE ROYAL NAVY AND ROYAL MARINES CHARITY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £384.10k | £412.62k | £426.66k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £449.11k | £434.83k | £417.16k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 12 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 08 August 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 01 September 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 18 July 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 18 July 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 12 July 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 11 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 19 July 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 23 August 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10TH AUGUST 1970 AS AMENDED ON THE 21/09/90, 23/03/95, 22/11/96 AND 23/2/06. LINKED TO CHARITY NO 259192 FOR ACCOUNTING PURPOSES BY UNITING DIRECTION 29/6/99
Charitable objects
1) FURTHERING EFFICIENCY OF THE ROYAL NAVAL AND ROYAL MARINES BY PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND ENTERTAINMENT FACILITIES. 2) ASSISTANCE NAVAL RATINGS OTHER RANKS ROYAL MARINES AND THEIR DEPENDENTS WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES 3) PROVIDING RESETTLEMENT AND FURTHER EDUCATION AND TRAINING FACILITIES FOR NAVAL RATINGS AND OTHER RANKS IN ROYAL MARINES 4) SUPPORT OF CHURCHES AND RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES FOR NAVAL RATINGS AND OTHER RANKS IN ROYAL MARINES 5) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL BE NECESSARY FOR NAVAL RATINGS AND OTHER ROYAL MARINES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window