BSO ENDOWMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the charitable activities of the Bournemouth Symphony Orchestra by providing or assisting in the provision of resources by which the orchestra may undertake activities of a musical education not financed by national or local authorities and to further other charitable purposes directed at improving the public taste and appreciation of the art of music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bournemouth
- Bristol City
- Devon
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Poole
- Portsmouth City
- Southampton City
Governance
- 24 October 1972: Standard registration
- BOURNEMOUTH ORCHESTRAS ENDOWMENT TRUST (Previous name)
- WESTERN ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Flockhart | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Annette D'Abreo | Trustee | 30 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Mary O'Sullivan | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10TH AUGUST 1970 AS AMENDED 12TH SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE WESTERN ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY LIMITED (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE SOCIETY") BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF THE RESOURCES BY WHICH THE SOCIETY MAY UNDERTAKE ACTIVITIES OF MUSICAL EDUCATION NOT FINANCED BY NATIONAL OR LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND TO FURTHER OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES DIRECTED AT IMPROVING THE PUBLIC TASTE AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART OF MUSIC.
Area of benefit
BOURNEMOUTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 SELDOWN LANE
POOLE
DORSET
BH15 1UF
- Phone:
- 01202644716
- Email:
- kroberts@bsorchestra.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window