THE UPPER ITCHEN VALLEY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation and safeguarding what is good in the character of the Upper Itchen Valley. The protection of the area from actions which may be detrimental to the amenities and scenic beauty of its rural character. The discouragement of undesirable destruction and disturbance of wildlife. The encouragement of the preservation of historic buildings of special interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 17 September 1970: Standard registration
- U I V S (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elaine Marion Labram | Chair | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gavin John Edgerley Harris OBE | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Fiona Parry | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Walter Hugh Ffennell | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JEREMY BROADLEY | Trustee | 18 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
LUCY COLLIS | Trustee | 27 November 2013 |
|
|||||
RICHARD HENRY COLEMAN | Trustee | 18 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALISON JOSEPHINE STANLEY MATTHEWS MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148 | £132 | £378 | £182 | £1.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £271 | £229 | £523 | £993 | £518 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD AUGUST 1970
Charitable objects
(A) TO PRESERVE AND SAFEGUARD WHAT IS GOOD IN THE CHARACTER OF THE UPPER ITCHEN VALLEY COMPRISING OF THE CIVIL PARISH OF ITCHEN VALLEY TOGETHER WITH ITCHEN STOKE AND OVINGTON AND ABBOTS WORTHY AND THAT PART OF THE PARISH OF KINGS WORTHY TO THE EAST OF THE A 33 ROAD. (B) TO PROTECT THE AREA FROM ANY PROPOSED ACTION WHICH WOULD BE DETERMINED TO THE AMENITIES AND SCENIC BEAUTY OF ITS RURAL CHARACTER. (C) TO DISCOURAGE THE UNDESIREABLE DESTRUCTION AND DISTURBANCE OF WILD LIFE. (D) TO ENCOURAGE THE PRESERVATION OF HISTORIC BUILDINGS AND OTHER BUILDINGS OF SPECIFIC INTEREST.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 The Old Dairy
Easton
WINCHESTER
Hampshire
SO21 1EU
- Phone:
- 01962 779066
- Email:
- emlabram@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window