NORFOLK AUTISTIC SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 24 September 1970: Standard registration
- 23 November 2005: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 23 November 2005: Funds transferred to 1089382 NORFOLK AUTISTIC SOCIETY
- N A S (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2004 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2004 | 23 February 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH MAY 1970 AS AMENDED 28TH JANUARY 1983 AS AMENDED FURTHER AND RE-ADOPTED 7 NOVEMBER 1997.
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND WELL-BEING OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH AUTISM AND CONDITIONS RELATED TO AUTISM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS WITHIN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS.
Area of benefit
CITY OF NORWICH AND COUNTY OF NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window