Financial history FAMILY GROUPS LIMITED

Charity number: 261622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £366.87k £356.62k £285.15k £369.68k £513.34k
Total expenditure £325.15k £267.04k £350.66k £350.10k £376.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £314.94k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £148.85k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.79k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £44.77k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £114.08k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £374.54k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.80k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £13.07k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0