Governing document FAMILY GROUPS LIMITED
Charity Number: 261622

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17TH JULY 1970 AND AMENDED ON 22ND OCTOBER 1972 AND 4 MARCH 1999, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 29 MAY 1999 AND 16 JUN 2010.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND DISTRESS AMONG FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS SUFFERING BY REASON OF ALCOHOLISM.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.