HINDU CULTURAL ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a place of worship for the Hindu Community, hold Hindu festivals and offer full facilities to all shades of thought within the Hindu religion. To advance education in Hindu Culture by offering facilities for reading, social and cultural activities. To provide day care to the elderly and community facilities for the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 21 October 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amit JUNEJA | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
RAVI MEHTA | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR S P MALTHORA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.60k | £14.88k | £111.18k | £76.02k | £77.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.97k | £38.85k | £111.16k | £63.21k | £101.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2024 | 254 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2024 | 254 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 May 2024 | 471 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 May 2024 | 471 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 April 2022 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2022 | 349 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2022 | 349 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 1968, AND 19 MAY 1996 AND 19 SEPTEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
A) TO ENABLE HINDUS TO WORSHIP, HOLD HINDU FESTIVALS AND PERFORM ALL RITES CONNECTED WITH BIRTHS, MARRIAGES AND DEATHS AND FULL FACILITIES SHALL BE OFFERED TO ALL SHADES OF THOUGHT WITHIN THE HINDU RELIGION. B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN HINDU CULTURE BY OFFERING FACILITIES FOR TEACHIN HINDI AND SANSKRIT LITERATURE, BY PROVIDING AN INFORMATION BUREAU FOR FURTHER STUDY OF HINDI AND SANSKRIT LITERATURE AND OFFERING A FORUM FOR LECTURES AND DISCUSSIONS ON HINDU CULTURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE MERSEYSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
253 EDGE LANE
LIVERPOOL
L7 2PH
- Phone:
- 01512637965
- Email:
- amit@bobbibeck.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window