THE CAMPDEN SOCIETY

Charity Number: 261665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To secure the protection of architectural & historical quality of Campden,its open spaces and its natural setting To promote high standards of planning, architecture and landscaping in Campden To stimulate interest in and concern for the character & beauty of Campden To promote awareness of the climate emergency,push for zero carbon solutions and protect terrestrial biodiversity, within Campden

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £69,613
Total expenditure: £3,125

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 July 2002: Standard registration
  • 02 February 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
  • 02 February 2024: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Devas Chair 04 November 2020
None on record
Owen Francis David O'Connell Trustee 25 April 2024
None on record
James Baumann Davies Trustee 25 April 2024
None on record
Susan Jane Pritchard Trustee 27 April 2023
None on record
Loyd Daniel Gilman Grossman Trustee 29 September 2022
THE ROYAL PARKS [LIMITED]
Received: On time
DAVID WYN ROBERTS Trustee 04 April 2022
THE GLOUCESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
GLOUCESTER DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
CHIPPING CAMPDEN MUSIC FESTIVAL
Received: On time
Vanessa Thornton Rigg Trustee 04 November 2020
CAMPDEN EDGE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/01/2024
Total gross income £8.52k £1.98k £7.73k £7.40k £69.61k
Total expenditure £9.45k £684 £4.74k £6.68k £3.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 30 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 30 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 JUNE 2002 "DIRECTION UNDER S.96 (5) GIVEN" AS AMENDED ON 26 JUL 2021
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST AND SHALL APPLY THE INCOME AND CAPITAL FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO SECURE THE PROTECTION OF THE ARCHITECTURAL AND HISTORIC QUALITY OF CAMPDEN INCLUDING ITS OPEN SPACES AND ITS NATURAL SETTING.
Area of benefit
CHIPPING CAMPDEN, THE VILLAGE OF BROAD CAMPDEN AND THEIR SURROUNDING AREAS
Registration history
  • 08 July 2002 : Standard registration
  • 02 February 2024 : Removed
  • 02 February 2024 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
THE Old Police Station
High Street
Chipping Campden
Gloucestershire
GL556HB
Phone:
07815005879