Financial history PURLEY PARK TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 261726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.58m £5.33m £5.39m £5.58m £6.30m
Total expenditure £4.53m £5.08m £5.17m £5.50m £5.73m
Income from government contracts £4.60m £5.07m £5.14m £5.44m £5.79m
Income from government grants N/A £165.91k £154.60k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £842.34k £7.90k £5.20k £122.40k £124.93k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.60m £5.32m £5.39m £5.44m £5.95m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.13k £120 £400 £11.47k £29.89k
Income - Other £129.39k £4.36k £0 £0 £195.68k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £104.89k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.53m £5.08m £5.17m £5.50m £5.73m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.00k £3.48k £8.30k £5.07k £3.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0