Accounts and annual returns THE PARRY HOUSE WELFARE FUND

Charity Number: 261730
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 04 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 11 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 13 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 13 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 09 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required