THE PARRY HOUSE WELFARE FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of Homes and Hostels for the relief of poverty and sickness and the advancement of education and training of poor individuals in need thereof, including persons wno have suffered legal restriction on their liberty in any penal or correctional establishment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 11 November 1970: Standard registration
- 30 April 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 30 April 2010: Funds transferred to 1131541 WYCOMBE HOMELESS CONNECTION CHRISTIAN TRUST
- PARRY HOUSE WELFARE FUND - (THE WELFARE FUND) (Working name)
- PARRY HOUSE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £340 | £402 | £447 | £548 | £536 | |
|
Total expenditure | £300 | £700 | £500 | £250 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 04 August 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 11 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 13 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 13 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 09 September 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED ON 13 JULY 1970 AS AMENDED 29 JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF HOMES AND HOSTELS FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF POOR INDIVIDUALS IN NEED THEREOF, INCLUDING PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED LEGAL RESTRICTION ON THEIR LIBERTY IN ANY PENAL OR CORRECTIONAL ESTABLISHMENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window