THE HARWICH SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To stimulate public interest in the Harwich area, promote high standards of planning and architecture and to secure the preservation, protection, development and improvement of features of historic or public interest in the Harwich area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 19 November 1970: Standard registration
- 15 May 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 15 May 2017: Funds transferred to 1161931 THE HARWICH SOCIETY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.34k | £69.79k | £57.11k | £83.49k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.69k | £60.96k | £67.12k | £70.28k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 03 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 19 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 19 October 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 10 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 10 September 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 10 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 16 July 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST SEPTEMBER 1970 AS AMENDED 30TH MARCH 1990
Charitable objects
A) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN HARWICH AREA. B) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN THE HARWICH AREA. C) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATRUES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE HARWICH AREA.
Area of benefit
THE BOROUGH OF HARWICH AND THE ADJOINING PARISHES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window