BRITISH CRYOGENICS COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Disseminating information about cryogenics by way of: a quarterly newsletter for members and sponsors; a website; publication of handbooks for the benefit of the public and those working in the field of cryogenics; arranging and attending open meetings/conferences to facilitate collaboration and exchange of ideas; providing assistance on request to individuals and corporate bodies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 December 1970: Standard registration
- BRITISH CRYOENGINEERING SOCIETY (Previous name)
- BRITISH CRYOGENICS COUNCIL (Previous name)
- BRITISH CYROENGINEERING SOCIETY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR BETH EVANS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Andrew James Blackett-May | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shrikant Pattalwar | Trustee | 31 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR BOB CLARIDGE BSC CPHYS FRMS | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR BILL GRAHAM BSC | Trustee | 11 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr ZIAD MELHEM PHDCPHYS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR PHIL COOK BSC CENG FICHEME | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr M'HAMED LAKRIMI PHDFINSTP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR RALPH GEOFFREY SCURLOCK FIMECHE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR DAMIAN PETER HAMPSHIRE PHDFINSTP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr OLEG KIRICHEK CPHYS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN SHEPHERD VANDORE BSC MBA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.59k | £11.78k | £22.56k | £17.80k | £42.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.68k | £11.03k | £12.53k | £17.36k | £20.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 10/08/1970, 19/04/ 1983, 20/03/1997, 23/03/2005, 28/11/2007 AND 18/11/2015 as amended on 15 Oct 2020 as amended on 15 Oct 2020 as amended on 06 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENTIFIC EDUCATION BY PROMOTING MAN'S KNOWLEDGE OF AND INTEREST IN CRYOGENICS, THEREBY FOSTERING THE DEVELOPMENT AND APPLICATION OF CRYOGENICS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS, SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Science & Technology Facilities Council
Rutherford Appleton Laboratory
Harwell Oxford
DIDCOT
OX11 0QX
- Phone:
- 07488358309
- Email:
- admin@bcryo.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window