Accounts and annual returns THE ROERIG TRUST

Charity number: 261846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 24 August 2024 201 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 04 July 2023 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 15 March 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required