THE KATHERINE MARTIN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of grants to nominated charities as directed by the will of Katherine Martin. The Structure, Governance & Management of the Trust is set out in the Trust Annual Report & Financial Statements, which also disclose its financial performance and position. Trust activities are funded from investment income derived from pooled investment portfolios and its shareholding in unlisted investments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 December 1970: Standard registration
- MRS KATHERINE MARTIN RESIDUARY ESTATE TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KMCT Trustee Limited | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.81m | £49.17m | £627.00k | £729.00k | £2.40m | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.59m | £46.65m | £599.00k | £520.00k | £1.19m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £49.76m | £49.12m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £49.00k | £49.00k | £627.00k | £729.00k | £153.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £551.00k | £613.00k | £586.00k | £502.00k | £1.15m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £46.04m | £46.03m | £13.00k | £18.00k | £33.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £26.00k | £28.00k | £61.00k | £60.00k | £75.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £525.00k | £585.00k | £525.00k | £442.00k | £1.08m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £12.00k | £11.00k | £13.00k | £18.00k | £33.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £35.41m | £38.16m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.60m | £1.84m | £1.91m | £1.57m | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £20.91m | £21.83m | £111.00k | £52.29m | £55.17m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.10m | -£1.66m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £26.60m | £27.46m | £9.00k | £19.00k | £24.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED IN THE PRINCIPAL REGISTRY ON THE 8 SEPTEMBER 1959, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 6 JULY 1995, TRUSTEES' MEETING OF 14 MAY 1996, AND ORDER DATED 20 DECEMBER 2004. AS AMENDED ON 14/07/2015 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED ON 10 JUN 2021 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30 JUL 2024
Charitable objects
UPON TRUST TO APPLY BOTH THE INCOME AND CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AND MANNER AS THE TRUSTEE SHALL IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT TO BE APPLIED TO FURTHER THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES (OR ANY OF THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES) OF ANY OF THE FOLLOWING CHARITIES: BARNARDO'S, REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 216250; NATIONAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO CHILDREN, REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 216401; ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 219099
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 352
BEVERLEY
HU17 6HS
- Phone:
- 07706 001639
- Email:
- clerk@kmct.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window