INSTITUTE OF BIOMEDICAL SCIENCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Institute of Biomedical Science (IBMS) is the professional body for biomedical scientists in the United Kingdom. It aims to promote and develop the role of biomedical science within healthcare to deliver the best possible service for patient care and safety.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£5,910,276
Donations and legacies | £81 | |
Charitable activities | £3.66m | |
Other trading activities | £1.90m | |
Investments | £357.70k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£5,330,123
Raising funds | £1.42m | |
Charitable activities | £3.91m | |
Other | £0 |
£465,847 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £384,214 from 1 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.42m | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.91m | |
Retained for future use | £580.15k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.42m | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.91m | |
Retained for future use | £1.05m |
People

32 Employee(s)
17 Trustee(s)
1960 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Hong Kong
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 November 1970: Standard registration
- 22 June 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- I B M S (Working name)
- INSTITUTE OF BIOMEDICAL SCIENCES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Andrew | Chair | 03 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Rouse | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel David Kearns | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Deacon | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Azuma Kalu | Trustee | 03 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Glen McDowell | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheri Scott | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tahmina Hussain | Trustee | 05 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Collins | Trustee | 05 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Jane Pitt | Trustee | 05 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Elizabeth Jean-Francois | Trustee | 05 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Houston | Trustee | 24 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zonya Jeffrey | Trustee | 24 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Victoria Bradley | Trustee | 13 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Linda Walsh | Trustee | 08 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Coles | Trustee | 06 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN USHER | Trustee | 02 June 2001 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.55m | £3.30m | £3.47m | £5.41m | £5.91m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.18m | £2.67m | £3.17m | £4.43m | £5.33m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £59.19k | £34.16k | £285.07k | £384.21k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £25.16k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £81 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.46m | £29.51k | £27.95k | £1.60m | £1.90m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.00m | £3.05m | £3.20m | £3.52m | £3.66m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £68.54k | £217.93k | £242.46k | £288.69k | £357.70k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.07m | £2.48m | £2.94m | £3.23m | £3.91m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.11m | £190.37k | £225.80k | £1.20m | £1.42m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £65.26k | £39.24k | £28.86k | £58.81k | £56.42k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £65.11k | £64.48k | £82.73k | £79.49k | £81.03k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.91m | £1.39m | £1.30m | £1.27m | £1.18m | |
|
Long-term investments | £9.70m | £11.89m | £12.94m | £11.75m | £12.28m | |
|
Other assets | £2.74m | £3.84m | £5.62m | £5.63m | £6.22m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £832.20k | £1.31m | £2.77m | £1.89m | £1.87m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/11/1942 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/06/1975 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/09/1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/08/1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/06/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/09/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/06/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/06/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 JUN 2016 as amended on 08 Jun 2019 as amended on 05 Jun 2021 as amended on 11 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE STUDY AND DEVELOPMENT OF MEDICAL LABORATORY SCIENCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Linked charities
- 21 November 1970 : Standard registration
- 22 June 2017 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
INSTITUTE OF BIOMEDICAL SCIENCE
12 COLDBATH SQUARE
LONDON
EC1R 5HL
- Phone:
- 02077130214
- Email:
- mail@ibms.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window