MILTON LILBOURNE VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND CHARITY

Charity Number: 261927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the charity shall be to provide or assist in the provision of facilities for the inhabitants of the parish of Milton Lilbourne for recreation or other leisure-time occupation in the interests of social welfare with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £19,637
Total expenditure: £17,938

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 January 1976: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian John Donaldson Chair 29 October 2020
None on record
Dr Jeremy Alan Ashton Trustee 31 December 2021
None on record
Oliver Benjamin Wright Trustee 26 May 2021
None on record
Michael Angel Trustee 29 April 2021
None on record
Jane Elizabeth Barne Trustee 12 April 2017
None on record
Anthony Edward David Wells Trustee 12 April 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £14.86k £16.55k £19.93k £12.67k £19.64k
Total expenditure £13.84k £18.18k £20.29k £13.80k £17.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.80k £16.73k £70 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 Cedars
Littleworth
PEWSEY
Wiltshire
SN9 5LF
Phone:
01672562659