Trustees THE CHELTENHAM BACH CHOIR
Charity number: 261961

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Bryant | Chair | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Winwood | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Suzanne Rockell | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebecca Rea | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Hazell | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Ryan | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH SILCOCK | Trustee | 07 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Margaret Helen Louise Salter | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr SHIRLEY ELLIOTT | Trustee | 29 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
EMMA REED | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.