Governing document INTERNATIONAL INSTITUTE OF COMMUNICATIONS

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7TH DECEMBER 1970 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED ON 27 AUGUST 1976, 10 SEPTEMBER 1977 AND 7 SEPTEMBER 1992 AND 27 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND CARRY OUT RESEARCH INTO THE IMPACT ON SOCIETY OF THE REVOLUTION IN THE TECHNOLOGY OF MASS-COMMUNICATION INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT AFFECTING THE GENERAL NATURE OF FOREGOING TELEVISION AND RADIO, INTO SCIENTIFIC TECHNIQUES AND TECHNOLOGY OF BROADCASTING. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.