THE WEALD OF KENT PROTECTION SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To protect & enhance the character of the Kentish Wealden towns, villages & countryside, to safeguard the amenities of the Weald of Kent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 01 January 1971: Standard registration
- WKPS (Working name)
- THE WEALD OF KENT PRESERVATION SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL BAX | Chair | 25 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Peta Clare Grant | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Northcroft | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER HUGH PAGE | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Fay Merrick | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS J RYMER-JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Jessamy Blanford | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.84k | £15.87k | £6.98k | £69.78k | £17.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.15k | £7.69k | £12.28k | £14.36k | £12.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH JUNE 1970, AMENDED 20TH JUNE 1975, 23RD JUNE 1978, 19TH JUNE 1987 AND 15TH JUNE 2005 as amended on 11 Aug 2021 as amended on 11 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT AND ENHANCE THE CHARACTER OF THE WEALDEN TOWNS, VILLAGES AND COUNTRYSIDE. TO SAFEGUARD THE AMENITIES OF THE WEALD OF KENT. TO CULTIVATE A WIDER INTEREST IN AND CARE FOR THE BEAUTY, HISTORY AND CHARACTER OF THE WEALD OF KENT.
Area of benefit
WEALD OF KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Castle Hurst
Bodiam
ROBERTSBRIDGE
TN32 5UW
- Phone:
- 01580861246
- Email:
- secretary@wkps.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window