THE CAMERON FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty hardship and distress among current and former general practitioners and their dependants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 January 1971: Standard registration
- 30 December 2019: Funds received from 239978 YORK DIVISION BRITISH MEDICAL ASSOCIATION CHARITIE...
- THE CAMERON FUND LIMITED (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Caroline Rickard | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Sangeetha Helen Sornalingam | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Robert Luigi Morley | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Brian McGregor | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Robert Nigel Barnett | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr John Francis Kedward | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Richard Mark Vautrey | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
Dr PETER JOHN PASHLEY HOLDEN | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|||||||
Dr Edward Gavin Crawford | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr SARAH FRANCES RANN | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Simon Parkinson | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Dr William Arnold McDowell | Trustee | 06 August 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Zoe Norris | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Vernon Harold Needham | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Dr William McAlpine | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Sean Phelan | Trustee | 18 May 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Terry John | Trustee | 24 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Dr CHARLES JOHN BRETT | Trustee | 05 December 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Dr ANDREW FRANCIS RODGETT | Trustee | 18 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £408.27k | £439.66k | £434.05k | £453.56k | £423.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £373.35k | £379.04k | £343.38k | £442.26k | £566.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 OCTOBER 1970 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 16 JUNE 1971, 14 JUNE 1972, 22 JUNE 1994, 11 JULY 1994 AND 11 JUNE 2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 AUG 2017 as amended on 06 Aug 2020 as amended on 05 Aug 2021 as amended on 14 May 2024
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF GENERAL MEDICAL PRACTITIONERS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS, EDUCATION AND ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF NECESSITOUS CHILDREN AND DEPENDANTS, AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED BY THE INCORPORATED BODY IN GENERAL MEETING (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION DATED 31/05/2016)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Cameron Fund
B M A House
Tavistock Square
LONDON
WC1H 9JP
- Phone:
- 02073880796
- Email:
- info@cameronfund.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window