THE SHIPWRIGHTS CHARITABLE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Shipwrights Company Charitable fund is constituted under the Deeds of Trust of 30 April 1948 and 22 December 1970, and is a registered charity, number 262043. Under the terms of reference laid down by the Court in 2002 donations are directed towards Maritime Projects, the City of London and "Ministering Authorities", with an emphasis on support for young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 January 1971: Standard registration
- 15 February 2014: Funds received from 313249 THE SHIPWRIGHTS COMPANY EDUCATIONAL TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas John Ashley Shaw | Chair | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Mary Mulvihill | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Marshall | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andreas George Bisbas | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sir George Michael Zambellas GCB DSC DL | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Charles Waldegrave Beale | Trustee | 14 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
LAURA MARY BUGDEN | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD HOBART JOHN DE COURCY MOORE FCA | Trustee | 01 May 1992 |
|
|
||||
The Worshipful Company of Shipwrights | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £467.52k | £464.24k | £412.74k | £373.93k | £431.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £450.78k | £410.20k | £456.30k | £378.16k | £397.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22ND DECEMBER 1970
Charitable objects
SUCH PURPOSES AND OBJECTS BEING CHARITABLE AT LAW AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE AND UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WORSHIPFUL CO OF SHIPWRIGHTS
IRONMONGERS HALL
SHAFTESBURY PLACE
BARBICAN
LONDON
EC2Y 8AA
- Phone:
- 02076062376
- Email:
- clerk@shipwrights.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window