AGE CONCERN BASILDON DISTRICT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to support those over 60 in the Basildon District. We offer advice and information about local and national services, including welfare benefits. We offer the services of approved gardeners and handymen. Our "Telephone Befriending Service" regularly contacts elderly persons who may be vulnerable or lonely.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Essex
Governance
- 25 February 1971: Standard registration
- 11 June 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BASILDON DISTRICT AGE CONCERN (Previous name)
- BASILDON URBAN DISTRICT OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.77k | £26.56k | £6.41k | £1.30k | £5.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.57k | £15.97k | £6.83k | £10.04k | £13.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 06 August 2012 | 188 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 14 March 2011 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 17 December 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 APRIL 2003.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE IN AND AROUND BASILDON DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
BASILDON DISTRICT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window