Financial history ROWDE VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 262095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.76k £2.03k £1.51k £5.11k £6.48k
Total expenditure £9.35k £8.25k £5.95k £19.27k £8.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A