Register of Charities - The Charity Commission ASHLEY CLINTON AND BARKER-MILL TRUST
Charity number: 311504-1
Linked charity
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 24 DEC 1979
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 06 OCT 2016
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08 MAY 2017
AS AMENDED ON 23 JUN 2017
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 20 FEB 2002
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16 MAR 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECT IS:
(1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO ADVANCE THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY CALLED ARNOLFINI GALLERY LIMITED, REGISTERED NUMBER 311504.
(2) IF AND INSOFAR AS THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY CANNOT BE APPLIED TOWARDS THE OBJECT IN CLAUSE (1), THE INCOME IS TO BE APPLIED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TOWARDS THE ADVANCEMENT OF CONTEMPORARY ARTS IN BRISTOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 20 June 1966: Standard registration
Other names
- BARKER-MILL TRUST (Previous name)
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.