VENICE IN PERIL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist financially,or otherwise,in the rescue and restoration of antiquities, ancient buildings, monuments, dwellings,archives and works of art situated in Venice and on the islands of the Venetian lagoon that have been damaged by floods,storms and inundations, rising damp,corrosive smog and other adverse elements; and the research into the environmental threats to the survival of the city.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Italy
Governance
- 11 March 1971: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN BASIL KEATES FSA FRSL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Conte Geri Della Rocca de Candal | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gaia Penteriani | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Deborah Howard | Trustee | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
JON DAVIS EMANUEL RAYMAN | Trustee | 28 April 2013 |
|
|||||
SARAH QUILL | Trustee |
|
||||||
RICHARD HASLAM | Trustee |
|
||||||
LADY SHEILA HALE | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN MILLERCHIP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LADY FRANCES CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Contessa MARINA MORRISSON ATWATER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £300.59k | £208.30k | £93.69k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £258.85k | £261.64k | £109.25k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5TH FEBRUARY 1971
Charitable objects
TO RESCUE AND RESTORE AND THEREBY SAVE FOR FUTURE GENERATIONS ALL ANTIQUITIES, ANCIENT BUILDINGS, MONUMENTS, ARCHIVES AND WORKS OF ART SITUATE IN VENICE AND ON THE ISLANDS OF THE VENETIAN LAGOON WHICH HAVE BEEN OF LATE AND ARE BECOMING INCREASINGLY DAMAGED BY FLOOD, STORMS AND INUADATIONS, RISING DAMP, CORROSIVE SMOG ANDOTHER ADVERSE ELEMENTS AND TO SUPPLY ALL AID AND MATERIALS NEEDED FOR THAT PURPOSE, RECOGNISING THAT THE SAME REPRESENT A VITAL ELEMENT IN THE HISTORY OF EUROPEAN CULTURE AND INDEED IN THE HERITAGE OF MANKIND, AND THAT ACCORDINGLY THEIR PRESERVATION IS IMPORTANT TO THE CULTURAL LIFE OF THIS COUNTRY.
Area of benefit
VENICE AND THE ISLANDS OF THE VENETIAN LAGOON
Contact information
- Address:
-
VENICE IN PERIL FUND
70 COWCROSS STREET
LONDON
EC1M 6EJ
- Phone:
- 02077366891
- Email:
- info@veniceinperil.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window