THE MRS C T M DUNN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To give to other charitable institutions or foundations within the United Kingdom of Great Britain.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 March 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward Davis | Trustee | 06 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.00k | £21.09k | £21.37k | £21.37k | £21.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.30k | £52.03k | £23.60k | £23.60k | £23.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 93 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 93 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 459 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 459 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18TH FEBRUARY 1971
Charitable objects
TO OR TOWARDS OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS IN THE SCHEDULED TERRITORIES AND IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE. THE "SCHEDULED TERRITORIES" SHALL MEAN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND (WHICH SHALL INCLUDE THE ISLE OF MAN AND THE CHANNEL ISLANDS) AUSTRALIA AND NEW ZEALAND.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
RUSSELL & CO
125 CHURCH STREET
MALVERN
WR14 2AH
- Phone:
- 01684 892000
- Email:
- jcroshaw@russell-law.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window