THE ALDEBURGH SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are 1. to encourage public interest in and care for the character of the town of Aldeburgh and of its surroundings 2. to encourage high standards of architecture and of town planning in the town 3. to encourage the preservation, development and improvement of general public amenity in the town and its surroundings
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Suffolk
Governance
- 27 May 1971: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Katherine Mackie | Chair | 08 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Charles Dow | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|||||||
Lynne Walker | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Stuart Brock | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Catherine Lynne Palmer | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
PAUL NICHOLAS BONGERS DE RATH | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Adrian James Brown | Trustee | 11 June 2015 |
|
|||||||
PETER GERALD ROYCE HILL | Trustee | 01 June 2012 |
|
|
||||||
SIR CHRISTOPHER KINGSTON HOWES | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||||
INGA MARGARET AMY GRIMSEY | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||||
ANTHONY Victor William BONE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.64k | £2.37k | £5.44k | £3.79k | £4.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.72k | £1.64k | £1.16k | £6.05k | £5.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30TH DECEMBER 1970 AMENDED 16 NOVEMBER 1973
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE (A) PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND CARE FOR THE CHARACTER OF THE TOWN OF ALDEBURGH AND OF ITS SURROUNDINGS. (B) HIGH STANDARDS OF ARCHITECTURE AND OF TOWN PLANNING IN THE BOROUGH. (C) THE PRESERVATION, THE DEVELOPMENT AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF GENERAL PUBLIC AMENITY IN THE TOWN AND ITS SURROUNDINGS.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF ALDEBURGH AND ITS SURROUNDINGS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Onemana
Alde House Drive
Aldeburgh
IP15 5EE
- Phone:
- 01728453427
- Email:
- info@aldeburghsociety.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window