THE SOCIETY OF LEATHER TECHNOLOGISTS AND CHEMISTS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the 'SLTC' is to assist and encourage the application of science and technology to the manufacture and utilisation of leather and related products and by the publication of journals and the holding of meetings, to further the development of scientific knowledge in the leather industry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
- Australia
- South Africa
- United States
Governance
- 10 October 1963: Standard registration
- S L T C LTD (Working name)
- SLTC LTD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kristopher Macdonald | Trustee | 26 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Karl Bernard Flowers | Trustee | 26 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Anthony Payne | Trustee | 26 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Henry Abbott | Trustee | 26 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Marcus | Trustee | 27 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Dunning | Trustee | 27 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Thompson | Trustee | 23 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Robert Trantum | Trustee | 23 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christine Mary Anscombe | Trustee | 24 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Anne Taylor | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Avery | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr William Robert Wise | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Miller FSLTC | Trustee | 23 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.20k | £35.13k | £29.80k | £33.21k | £36.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.62k | £46.37k | £44.13k | £37.30k | £30.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 DECEMBER 1951 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 23 OCTOBER 1972, 27 SEPTEMBER 1974, 6 OCTOBER 1985 AND 9 OCTOBER 1992.
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST AND ENCOURAGE THE APPLICATION OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY TO THE MANUFACTURE AND UTILISATION OF LEATHER AND RELATED PRODUCTS AND, BY THE PUBLICATION OF JOURNALS AND THE HOLDING OF MEETINGS, TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF SCIENTIFIC KNOWLEDGE IN THE LEATHER INDUSTRY. (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED THE 22ND DECEMBER 1951)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office 39
Eastern Way
Daventry
NN11 0QB
- Phone:
- 01604452552
- Email:
- office@sltc.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window