Financial history THE APOLLO THEATRE (ISLE OF WIGHT) TRUST

Charity number: 262257
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £15.81k £30.15k £18.78k £19.88k £14.99k
Total expenditure £16.02k £17.27k £30.13k £16.37k £20.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.53k £16.57k N/A N/A