Trustees THE APOLLO THEATRE (ISLE OF WIGHT) TRUST
Charity number: 262257

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL MARTIN JENNINGS | Chair | 01 January 2001 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Reading | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Jane Cook | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Reading | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phil Cardew | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Underwood | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Mackenzie | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Jones-Evans | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL JOHN BURNS | Trustee | 23 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN KENNERLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.