Governing document THE RETIREMENT LEASE HOUSING ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 262263
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES MODEL H10 1968 (CHARITABLE) ADOPTED 1ST MARCH 1971 AS AMENDED 28TH FEBRUARY 1987, 14TH MARCH 1983, 15TH JULY 1986 AND 22ND MARCH 1988
Charitable objects
TO CARRY ON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY THE BUSINESS OF PROVIDING SHELTERED HOUSING AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES AND ALSO THE PROVISION OF HOMES TO PROVIDE RESIDENTIAL AND NURSING CARE FOR ELDERLY RETIRED PERSONS OR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.