ROTARY CLUB OF SAXMUNDHAM AND DISTRICT BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assistance to individuals and support for charities, locally. Support for the the Rotary movement's international initiatives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Suffolk
Governance
- 27 April 1971: Standard registration
- 12 September 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- ROTARY CLUB OF SAXMUNDHAM AND DISTRICT (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.46k | £7.13k | £3.24k | £14.78k | £4.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.65k | £5.64k | £4.90k | £13.63k | £3.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 8TH FEBRUARY 1971
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS SOCIETIES AND OBJECTS AS THE ROTARY CLUB OS SAXMUNDHAM AND DISTRICT SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window