THE COSTUME SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to promote, for the benefit of the public, education in dress throughout the ages and across the world and to encourage the preservation of historic examples of dress together with relevant source materials.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 May 1971: Standard registration
- 23 August 2023: Funds received from 1166336 THE DAPHNE BULLARD, KATHY CALLOW AND ELIZABETH HAM...
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Judith Lynn Hepner | Trustee | 06 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beth Evans | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Monica Alice Hodgson | Trustee | 09 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Paul Holman | Trustee | 09 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Benjamin David Whyman | Trustee | 09 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Persson Swain | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Haleh Moravej | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Charles Warren | Trustee | 07 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Wright | Trustee | 07 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Natascha Radclyffe Thomas | Trustee | 08 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.37k | £40.48k | £297.68k | £52.59k | £112.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.79k | £42.13k | £43.87k | £50.67k | £53.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 MARCH 1973, AS AMENDED 10 APRIL 1988, 15 SEPTEMBER 1990, 30 MARCH 1997, 24 JUNE 2000 AND 3 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED ON 02 JUL 2017 as amended on 04 May 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, EDUCATION IN DRESS THROUGHTOUT THE AGES AND TO ENCOURAGE THE PRESERVATION OF HISTORIC EXAMPLES AND SOURCE MATERIAL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Costume Society
Atlas Chambers
33 West Street
Brighton
East Sussex
BN1 2RE
- Phone:
- 01163053423
- Email:
- info@costumesociety.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window