BELCHAMP WALTER VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees are responsible for the management of the Village Hall on behalf of the Parish Council who are the Custodian Trustees. The activities of the trustees is therefore primarily to ensure that the venue is available for village functions and private hirings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
- Suffolk
Governance
- 03 May 1971: Standard registration
- BELCHAMP WALTER VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT TRUST (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Tara Walker | Chair | 18 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Michael Frederick Shepherd | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tina Heidi Gunfield | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Christopher Douglas Fairbanks Weston | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rita Louise Rosalie Scott | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Brigid Poynter | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Michael Krelle | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Charles Francis Valent Raymond | Trustee | 18 April 2007 |
|
|
||||
David Peter Poynter | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.18k | £12.89k | £3.04k | £6.50k | £7.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.88k | £5.38k | £6.57k | £3.53k | £7.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 9TH DECEMBER 1970
Charitable objects
AS A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BELCHAMP WALTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wheatleys
Hall Road
Belchamp Walter
SUDBURY
Suffolk
CO10 7AS
- Phone:
- 01787 881620
- Email:
- Rbpbwvh@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window