Trustees BELCHAMP WALTER VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 262403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Tara Walker Chair 18 May 2015
None on record
Michael Frederick Shepherd Trustee 16 September 2024
None on record
Tina Heidi Gunfield Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Benjamin Christopher Douglas Fairbanks Weston Trustee 18 July 2023
None on record
Rita Louise Rosalie Scott Trustee 18 July 2023
None on record
Rebecca Brigid Poynter Trustee 11 April 2023
None on record
Christopher Michael Krelle Trustee 08 February 2017
None on record
Charles Francis Valent Raymond Trustee 18 April 2007
None on record
David Peter Poynter Trustee
None on record