IMPALA RIFLE CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 06 May 1971: Standard registration
- 10 February 1994: Removed (Ceased to be charitable)
- 01 December 1997: Removed (Ceased to be charitable)
- 01 December 1997: Standard registration
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 MAY 1965 AS AMENDED 17 MARCH 1971
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE SKILL IN RIFLE SHOOTING BY PROVIDING INSTRUCTION AND PRACTICE IN THE USE OF THE SMALL BORE RIFLE TO ANY OF HER MAJESTY'S SUBJECTS SO THAT THEY WILL BE BETTER FITTED TO SERVE THEIR COUNTRY IN THE ARMED FORCES, TERRITORIAL ARMY OR ANY OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN WHICH THEIR SERVICE MAY BE REQUIRED IN THE DEFENCE OF THE REALM IN TIMES OF PERIL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.