STURMER VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide village hall facilities to local community without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, including use for meetings, lectures, classes, recreation and leisure-time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 07 April 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Theresa Catherine Notcutt | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Terrie Sharon Jones | Trustee | 27 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
GRACE ELLEN PORTH | Trustee | 12 June 1999 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE MAI POWER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE ALLISON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.39k | £11.96k | £13.07k | £3.19k | £4.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.28k | £5.13k | £4.51k | £3.89k | £4.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £11.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 20TH JANUARY 1972
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF STURMER WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, UNCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FO OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
STURMER
Contact information
- Address:
-
MERE COTTAGE
ROOST END
STURMER
HAVERHILL
CB9 7XW
- Phone:
- 01440703087
- Email:
- porthjo@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window