THE ABBEYFIELD BASILDON SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of accommodation, care and companionship for senior citizens in accordance with the aims and principles of The Abbeyfield Society Limited.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 17 June 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL STANTON-DUNNE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sean Michael Stanton-Dunne | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abbas Nurbhai | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA STANTON GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD THOMSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £395.13k | £335.28k | £264.08k | £272.74k | £380.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £367.67k | £283.05k | £266.63k | £345.19k | £360.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23RD MARCH 1971 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23RD MARCH 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/11/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04/12/2015
Charitable objects
1THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO CARRY ON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY THE PROVISION AND MANAGEMENT OF HOUSING, ACCOMMODATION AND ASSISTANCE FOR THE RELIEF AND CARE OF ELDERLY PERSONS SUFFERING FROM THE DISABILITIES OF OLD AGE OR OTHERWISE BEING IN NEED AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING (OR ASSISTING IN PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING) HOUSES AND HOMES FOR SUCH ELDERLY PERSONS AND PROVIDING (OR ASSISTING IN PROVIDING) AMENITIES OR SERVICES FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH ELDERLY PERSONS.
Area of benefit
BASILDON AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 SOPWITH CRESCENT
HURRICANE WAY
WICKFORD BUSINESS PARK
WICKFORD
ESSEX
SS11 8YU
- Phone:
- 01268561800
- Email:
- home@abbeyfieldbasildon.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window