THE FOUR WINDS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To support financially the furtherance of Evangelical Christian work, education and relief of the poor and needy in the UK and overseas 2. Where funds allow, to benefit secular organisations concerned with education and the relief of the poor and needy in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 June 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS SUE CHARTERS | Trustee | 15 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES MARY CHARTERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON CHARTERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER-JOHN CHARTERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.34k | £301.44k | £191.85k | £93.03k | £77.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £119.92k | £312.61k | £183.05k | £62.48k | £90.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3RD MAY 1971
Charitable objects
THE SUPPORT BY CONTRIBUTION LOAN GIFT SUBSCRIPTION OR OTHERWISE OF ANY RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR WORK WHICH SHALL BE ESTABLISHED OR MAINTAINED FOR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES:- THE FURTHERANCE OF PROTESTANT EVANGELICAL AND SECULAR EDUCATION; THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE PROTESTANT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS; THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF MISSIONARY ACTIVITY DESIGNED FOR THE PROPAGATION OF SUCH PROTESTANT EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN FAITH; THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY; THE HELP AND COMFORT OF THE SICK AND AGED AND GENERALLY FOR SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
64 STATION ROAD
DRAYTON
PORTSMOUTH
PO6 1PJ
- Phone:
- 02392321250
- Email:
- fourwindstrust1971@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window