Financial history BELSIZE CHARITABLE TRUST NO 1

Charity Number: 262535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/08/2020 15/08/2021 15/08/2022 15/08/2023 15/08/2024
Total gross income £11.49k £8.82k £9.82k £13.17k £15.23k
Total expenditure £0 £20.70k £0 £12.24k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A