THE PILGRIM HALL CHRISTIAN TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for Pilgrim Hall Christian Conference Centre, supporting a venue for churches and Christian organisations, groups and individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
- 08 June 1971: Standard registration
- 01 March 2016: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 01 March 2016: Funds transferred to 294387 Waverley Abbey Trust
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2010 | 30/11/2011 | 30/11/2012 | 30/11/2013 | 30/11/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £15.00k | £0 | £275 | £335 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £400 | £0 | £4.79k | £4.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2014 | 21 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2013 | 21 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2012 | 23 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10TH MARCH 1971 AND RESOLUTION DATED 21ST FEBRUARY 1983
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADMINISTRATION OF ANY PROPERTY OR ESTATE USED OR INTENDED FOR ANY RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT INSTITUTION OR WORK. (B) THE SUPPORT BY CONTRIBUTION LOAN GIFT SUBSCRIPTION OR OTHERWISE OF ANY RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR WORK WHICH SHALL BE ESTABLISHED OR MAINTAINED FOR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES:- (1) THE FURTHERANCE OF RELIGIOUS AND SECULAR EDUCATION. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE PROTESTANT AND EVANGELICAL TENETS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH EITHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS. (3) THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF MISSIONARY ACTIVITY DESIGNED FOR THE SPREAD OF SUCH CHRISTIAN FAITH. (4) THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY. (5) THE HELP AND COMFORT OF THE SICK AND AGED. (C) GENERALLY THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANY RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS NOT INCONSISTENT WITH THE FOREGOING WHICH MAY FROM TIME TO TIME COMMEND ITSELF TO THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window