Financial history W H SMITH BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 262581
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £217.50k £155.36k £153.14k £209.23k £177.59k
Total expenditure £212.77k £415.19k £229.76k £248.18k £293.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A