W H SMITH BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide financial support to serving and retired members of staff and close family members who find themselves in severe financial difficulties through no fault of their own. Provide recuperative holidays following long term sickness or after major surgery, carer breaks, palliative holidays and special equipment for less able staff.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- France
- Germany
- Guernsey
- Hong Kong
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Italy
- Jersey
- Malaysia
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Qatar
- Scotland
- Singapore
- Spain
- United States
Governance
- 23 June 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNETTE ELIZABETH COURT | Chair | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Webb OBE | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Brett Tiley | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JAMES MOORHEAD | Trustee | 01 December 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £217.50k | £155.36k | £153.14k | £209.23k | £177.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £212.77k | £415.19k | £229.76k | £248.18k | £293.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26/7/62 AS VARIED BY DEEDS OF VARIATION DATED 21/4/71, 2/2/74, 9/1/79, 26/7/84, 7/10/88, 26/3/92, 1/4/93, 19/8/02 AND 1/9/06
Charitable objects
GRANTS TO EMPLOYEES AND EX-EMPLOYEES OF THE W H SMITH GROUP AND THEIR DEPENDENTS, BEING POOR AND NECESSITOUS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Greenbridge Road
SWINDON
SN3 3LD
- Phone:
- 01793562094
- Email:
- BenFund@whsmith.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window