THE NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF MEDICAL HERBALISTS LIMITED EDUCATION FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To establish and maintain research facilities, scholarships and studentships in the science of herbal medicine and medical herbal research and to support related research programmes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 June 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL JEREMY HAMBLY NIMH BACC | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY P CARTER MNIMH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEBORAH LOUISE SWEETMAN BSC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £282.12k | £633.04k | £871.26k | £510.41k | £3.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £693.20k | £813.94k | £679.35k | £351.35k | £4.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £134.00k | £500 | £76.15k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £490.56k | £864.24k | £429.76k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £8.48k | £6.51k | £4.51k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £130.00k | £0 | £76.15k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £804.14k | £670.09k | £345.74k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £5.49k | £2.26k | £2.65k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £4.40k | £3.97k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £5.49k | £2.26k | £2.65k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £4.31k | £7.00k | £2.97k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26 APR 1971, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME 25 SEPT 1985. AS AMENDED ON 10 APR 2017
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH A SCHOOL FOR THE TRAINING AND TUITION OF STUDENTS OF MEDICAL HERBALISM GIVING BOTH LECTURES IN THEORETICAL ASPECTS AND DEMONSTRATIONS IN PRACTICAL TRAINING. (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE DECLARATION OF TRUST).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD DAIRY
DURGATES
WADHURST
TN5 6DE
- Phone:
- 01892783027
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window