BENNINGTON HALL TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The net Income of the Fund is to be used for the improvement of the Christian Education given to children and young people in the Free Churches, Missions, Sunday Schools or Junior Churches in the area covered by Cheltenham and District Education Council in 2001, and also in the wider work of Christian Education as the Trustees shall deem appropriate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 14 June 1971: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARBARA LOUISE MIDDLETON | Chair | 23 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Valerie Hoskins | Trustee | 20 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Brian Hall | Trustee | 23 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
CELIA DENISE KIDD | Trustee | 23 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY ODELL | Trustee | 18 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CHARLES VARLEY | Trustee | 18 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ANN ALDRED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUNE MARGARET SCARRETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAREN ANNE SAGE MCFARLANE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.25k | £4.33k | £4.42k | £4.54k | £4.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.99k | £1.94k | £3.02k | £5.83k | £4.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PRINCIPLES AND RULES OF THE SCHEME ADOPTED 15TH MARCH 1971 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION (CONCURRED WITH BTY THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS UNDER S.74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 DATED 7TH MAY 2002) AS AMENDED ON 15 SEPTEMBER 2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN EDUCATION GIVEN TO CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE FREE CHURCHES, MISSIONS, SUNDAY SCHOOL OR JUNIOR CHURCHES IN THE AREA COVERED BY CHELTENHAM AND DISTRICT EDUCATION COUNCIL IN 2001, AND ALSO IN THE WIDER WORK OF CHRISTIAN EDUCATION AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DEEM APPROPRIATE.
Area of benefit
THE AREA COVERED BY CHELTENHAM AND DISTRICT EDUCATION COUNCIL IN 2001.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Pine Bank
Bishop's Cleeve
CHELTENHAM
GL52 8JW
- Phone:
- 01242674267
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window