CHARITY OF WILLIAM GERRARD OTHERWISE KNOWN AS THE CHURCH ESTATE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian activities associated with St Peter's Maxey and the village of Maxey
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Cambridgeshire
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 07 July 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John William Hickling Mr | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Mary Merrill Mrs | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL CHARLES LOVEDER Mr | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.40k | £22.15k | £22.15k | £23.87k | £24.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.74k | £17.60k | £0 | £14.32k | £14.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 21 December 2023 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 04 December 2020 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL OF 10 JANUARY 1484 PR VOL 24 P 150 AS AMENDED ON 17 OCT 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE USE AND REPAIR OF THE CHURCH OF ST PETER MAXEY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Tuckers Nook
Maxey
PETERBOROUGH
PE6 9EH
- Phone:
- 07740983217
- Email:
- sheila.merrill47@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window