SAWBRIDGEWORTH ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MAKING GRANTS TO SAWBRIDGEWORTH AND HIGH WYCH PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCILS TOWARDS THE COST OF INSURANCE, REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF THE CHURCH AND CHURCHYARDS OF THOSE PARISHES FOR WHICH THEY ARE RESPONSIBLE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 06 July 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
F G PENKETH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Brampton | Trustee | 25 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Kathleen Squire | Trustee | 25 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Heard | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Julie Patterson | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.88k | £10.12k | £13.66k | £16.49k | £17.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.25k | £7.71k | £10.25k | £13.82k | £27.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 1/06/1971
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES DIRECTLY RELATING TO THE PARISH CHURCHES OF ST MARY SAWBRIDGE AND ST JAMES HIGH WYCH INCLUDING THE UPKEEP AND REPAIR OF THE OF THE ADJOINING CHURCHYARDS.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISHES OF GREAT ST MARY, SAWBRIDGE AND ST JAMES, HIGH WYCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 The Stables
Great Hyde Hall
Hatfield Heath Road
Sawbridgeworth
CM21 9JA
- Phone:
- 07770978256
- Email:
- clarkpf@hydehall.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window