Governing document HARLOW HOSPITAL RADIO

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/02/1971 AS AMENDED ON 01/03/1988 AS AMENDED ON 14/08/1989 AS AMENDED ON 01/08/1990 AS AMENDED ON 01/08/1996 AS AMENDED ON 29/07/1997 AS AMENDED ON 23/07/1998 AS AMENDED ON 30/07/2009 AS AMENDED ON 21/07/2011 as amended on 29 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS INFIRMITY AND OLD AGE BY PROVIDING A LOCAL BROADCASTING SERVICE TO BE TRANSMITTED BY LANDLINE OR BY OTHER MEANS TO THE PRINCESS ALEXANDRA HOSPITAL, HARLOW, OR TO ANY OTHER SIMILAR ORGANISATION OR INSTITUTION ESTABLISHED FOR THE RELIEF OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
HARLOW
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.