Trustees HARLOW HOSPITAL RADIO
Charity number: 262709

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW MEADOWS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PAUL CHILD | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Bull | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonny Hayes | Trustee | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT AYTON | Trustee | 14 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Linda Ranger | Trustee | 10 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARK RANGER | Trustee | 29 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE ANDREWS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.